Peck, David James McMahon (CPSO#: 65091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus Dept of Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3221
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peck Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Peck ( CPSO# 65091 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3221


Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES MCMAHON PECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993