Peliowski, Arie (CPSO#: 77624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Dept. of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Peliowski & Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rabinovitch ( CPSO# 82660 )
Dr. A. Peliowski ( CPSO# 77624 )

Business Address:
Synergy Sports Medicine and
Rehabilitation
235 Wallace Ave
Toronto ON  M6H 1V5
Phone Number: (416) 703-3525

Business Address:
The Hospital For Sick Children
Dept. of Anesthesia & Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIE PELIOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELIOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003