Peltz, Joseph Charles (CPSO#: 104781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000 Ext. 6186
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Peltz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Peltz ( CPSO# 104781)

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH CHARLES PELTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELTZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015