Penciner, Richard David (CPSO#: 64095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Penciner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Penciner ( CPSO# 64095 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD DAVID PENCINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENCINER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1992