Peng, Philip Wenn-Hsin (CPSO#: 64434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Fax: (416) 603-6494
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Anesthesia
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6269
Fax: 416-323-2666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Wasser Pain Management Centre
Mount Sinai Hospital
1160 11/F 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2333
Fax: (416) 586-5067
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip Peng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Peng ( CPSO# 64434 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
McL 2-405 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Wasser Pain Management Centre
1160 - 11/F 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
OR Suite
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6269

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP WENN-HSIN PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1995