Penner, Todd Patrick (CPSO#: 69046)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion 8 324
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6220
Fax: (416) 603-6221
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Todd Penner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Penner ( CPSO# 69046 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Main Pavilion 8 324
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD PATRICK PENNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000