Perelman, Vsevolod Seva (CPSO#: 71398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8054 yonge street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Canada
Phone: (905) 886-1212 Ext. 4
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perelman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Perelman ( CPSO# 71398 )

Business Address:
8054 Yonge Street East
Thornhill ON  L4J 1W3
Phone Number: (905) 886-1212

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VSEVOLOD SEVA PERELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERELMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999