Perera, Gihan Christopher (CPSO#: 96329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington St N, Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3570 King St. E
Kitchener ON  N2A2W1
Canada
Phone: 5197474300 Ext. 8340
Fax: 5198948307
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gihan Perera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perera ( CPSO# 96329 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 8E7
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 662-3303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIHAN CHRISTOPHER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016