Perkes, Christopher (CPSO#: 88554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Perkes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Perkes ( CPSO# 88554 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
5th Floor
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER PERKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013