Perkins, Bruce Joseph Louis Allan (CPSO#: 69190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leadership Sinai Ctr for Diabetes
60 Murray Street
Room L5 210 Mail Box 16
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-8763
Fax: (647) 826-1528
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Leadership Sinai Centre for Diabete
60 Murray Street, L5-209, Box 16
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8763
Fax: (416) 826-1528
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bruce A. Perkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Perkins ( CPSO# 69190 )

Business Address:
Leadership Sinai Centre for Diabetes
60 Murray Street
Room L5-210
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2M9

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 586-8763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE JOSEPH LOUIS ALLAN PERKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2003