Perkins, David Neil (CPSO#: 72203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 620
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 949-0372
Fax: (905) 949-0472
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David N. Perkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Perkins ( CPSO# 72203 )

Business Address:
Suite 620
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 949-0372

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID NEIL PERKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002