Pernica, Jeffrey Michael (CPSO#: 83961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A 30
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77577
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Pernica Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pernica ( CPSO# 83961 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 3A - 30
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Botswana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MICHAEL PERNICA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERNICA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2006 to 12 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2007