Pervez, Yasmin (CPSO#: 69612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Health Centre
3420, Hurantario street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: 905 272-4082
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 905 684-6411
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 905 684-6411
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmin Pervez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Pervez ( CPSO# 69612 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Phone Number: (905) 272-0165

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Yasmin  Pervez  may  practice  medicine  independently  in  Internal
                  Medicine.