Peters, Myta (CPSO#: 85221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Bhatnagar, Mita (used until: 14 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nagpur University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hullmark Corporate Centre
503-4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N0G3
Phone: (647) 748-0100
Fax: (647) 748-0101
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Centre
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0G4
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Myta Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peters ( CPSO# 85221 )

Business Address:
Hullmark Corporate Centre
503-4789 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (647) 748-0100

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
4062 Confederation Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5B 0G4
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYTA PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008