Petroff, Howard Lawrence (CPSO#: 58239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building E
Suite 200B
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-1090
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Howard L. Petroff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Petroff ( CPSO# 58239 )

Business Address:
Suite 200B
Building E
1105 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD LAWRENCE PETROFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETROFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988