Petsikas, Dimitri Jimmy (CPSO#: 65515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone: (613) 548-2383
Fax: (613) 549-2902
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitri Petsikas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Petsikas ( CPSO# 65515 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
102 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V6
Phone Number: (613) 548-2383

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIMITRI JIMMY PETSIKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETSIKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993