Pflugfelder, Peter Werner (CPSO#: 51330)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Pflugfelder Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre Hospital Medical Record Dept 339 Windermere Rd London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 28 Jun 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2017