Phalpher, Prashant Nagrath (CPSO#: 86754)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird st East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58057
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phalpher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phalpher ( CPSO# 86754 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASHANT NAGRATH PHALPHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHALPHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2010