Pham, Chien Vu (CPSO#: 68124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
796 Burnhampthorpe Road West,
Unit 2
Mississauga ON  L5C 2R9
Phone: (905) 270-6454
Fax: (905) 270-6460
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chien Pham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pham ( CPSO# 68124 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
796 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 2R9
Phone Number: (905) 270-6454

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHIEN VU PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1997