Pham, Quynh Ngoc (CPSO#: 60835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 866-6204
Fax: (647) 799-0302
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quynh Pham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Pham ( CPSO# 60835 )

Business Address:
Suite 611
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 866-6204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUYNH NGOC PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990