Phillips, Ian Gardner (CPSO#: 70092)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 824-0660
Fax: (519) 824-2326
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Phillips ( CPSO# 70092 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
Suite 200
89 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 824-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GARDNER PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001