Phillips, Katherine Grace (CPSO#: 71348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haldimand Family Heatlh Team
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: 289-683-0600
Fax: (905) 768-2879
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Haldimand General Hospital
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-3311
Fax: (905) 768-4133
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay, Ontario
K0J 1B0
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: 1-613-756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0168
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Phillips ( CPSO# 71348 )

Business Address:
Haldimand Family Health Team
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE GRACE PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 09 Apr 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2000