Phillips, Randall Noel (CPSO#: 26786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MedPoint Medical Centre
Citi Plaza
Suite 233
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medpoint Clinic - Byron
Unit 1
1240 Commissioner Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Canada
Phone: (519) 472-4343
Fax: (519) 472-0103
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Randall N. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Phillips ( CPSO# 26786 )

Business Address:
MedPoint Medical Centre
Citi Plaza
Suite 233
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Business Address:
Suite 103
1240 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-4343

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANDALL NOEL PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1981