Philpott, John Frederick (CPSO#: 62960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Boomerang Health : SickKids
9401 Jane Street, Suite 211
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone: (905) 553-3155
Fax: (905) 553-8120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

840 Coxwell Avenue
Suite 219
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 696-0030
Fax: (416) 913-0016
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cleveland Clinic Canada
Brookfield Place
181 Bay Street, Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: (416) 507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK PHILPOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILPOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1992