Philteos, George Samir Rashed (CPSO#: 75331)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Mar 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: Rashed, George Samir (used until: 16 Jul 2003 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone: (905) 427-1419
Fax: (905) 427-0346
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge health Ajax and
Pickering Health Centre
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Philteos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Philteos ( CPSO# 75331 )

Business Address:
205 - 601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 427-1419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE SAMIR RASHED PHILTEOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILTEOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jul 2000 to 30 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2001