Phua, Peter Daniel (CPSO#: 103982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
407-1 Eglinton E
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone: (888) 282-7763
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.D.Phua Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phua ( CPSO# 103982)

Business Address:
1 Eglinton East
Unit 407
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (888) 282-7763

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DANIEL PHUA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHUA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017