Piccinin, Laura Rose (CPSO#: 70108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: (705) 675-4794
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Piccinin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Piccinin ( CPSO# 70108 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4790

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA ROSE PICCININ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICCININ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1999