Pierratos, Andreas (CPSO#: 51339)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
200 Church Street
Weston
Weston ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 657-2669
Fax: (416) 657-2669
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Regional Hospital
Wilson site
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 657-2669
Fax: (416) 657-2669
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andreas Pierratos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pierratos ( CPSO# 51339 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
200 Church Street
Suite 307
Weston ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 657-2669

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS PIERRATOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRATOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1985