Pierro, Agostino (CPSO#: 57646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Apr 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General &Thorac Surgery
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7340
Fax: (416) 813-7477
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Agostino Pierro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pierro ( CPSO# 57646 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of General and
Thoracic Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7340

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Mar 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Agostino Pierro may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is approved by the Chair, Division of General
                        Surgery, Department of  Surgery,  in  which  Dr.  Pierro  holds  an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to  the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires when Dr. Pierro no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.