Pinto, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 51345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Feb 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Lynch Medical Centre
209A-157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone: (905) 457-2877
Fax: (905) 457-6259
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MA Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pinto ( CPSO# 51345 )

Business Address:
Queen Lynch Medical Centre
Suite 209A
157 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 457-2877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Aug 2004

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2004 Active View Details [+]
            As  from February 11, 2004, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Anthony Pinto:

            (a)   that for a period of two (2) years from his return to practise, Dr. Pinto
                  co-operate  with  any  medical  inspector chosen by the College who shall
                  conduct  three  inspections  of  Dr.  Pinto's  OHIP  billings  and  their
                  supporting  chart  entries  for  specified   codes  and  periods.   These
                  inspections shall be conducted approximately six,  twelve and twenty four
                  months after his return to practise; 

            (b)   that the costs of the inspections referred to in paragraph  (a) herein be
                  borne by Dr. Pinto; and,

            (c)   that Dr. Pinto hire and retain an arm's-length employee who shall perform
                  all secretarial and billing functions for Dr. Pinto's practice.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Feb 2004
Summary:

On February 11, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Pinto have committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that he has been found guilty of an offence 
that is relevant to his suitability to practice for being found guilty of defrauding the 
Workplace Safety and Insurance Board of more than $5,000. 
 
The Discipline Committee directs: 
 
1)  Dr. Pinto to attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded. 
 
2) Dr. Pinto s certificate of registration be suspended for a period of 12 months     
       commencing February 11, 2004, six months of which shall be suspended if 
Dr.        Pinto, 
(a)         makes restitution to the Workplace Safety Insurance Board  in the 
            amount of $200,000.00, by making monthly payments to the WSIB 
            in the amount of $5,000, immediately upon returning to practice, 
            provided the amount of any such monthly payment does not exceed 
            20% of Dr. Pinto=s gross billing for that month, in which case Dr. 
            Pinto will pay to the WSIB 20% of his gross billing for that month; 
            and 
(b)         within six months of the date of this Order, successfully completes, 
            at his own expense, the College s ethics course. 
 
3)  That in the event that Dr. Pinto fails to comply with the requirements 
      under paragraph 3(a) and (b) above, the suspension of Dr. Pinto s certificate  
          of  registration  shall  resume  and  continue  for  the  remaining  six  (6) 
months. 
 
4) That the following terms and conditions be placed on Dr. Pinto s certificate of   
    registration: 
(a)         that for a period of two (2) years from his return to practise, Dr.  
            Pinto co-operate with any medical inspector chosen by the College 
            who shall conduct three inspections of Dr. Pinto s OHIP billings  
            and their supporting chart entries for specified codes and   
            periods subsequent to the date of this Order of the inspector s  
            choosing. These inspections shall be conducted approximately six, 
            twelve and twenty four months after his return to practise; 
(b)         that the costs of the inspections referred to in paragraph (a)   
         herein be borne by Dr. Pinto; and.  
(c)         that Dr. Pinto hire and retain an arm s-length employee who shall  
            perform all secretarial and billing functions for Dr. Pinto s practice.  
 
 5)    Dr. Pinto pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500 within twelve (12)                months of 
the date of this Order. 
 
6)    That the results of this proceeding be included in the Register. 
              
                                                              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2004