Pitre, Lyne (CPSO#: 57073)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
745 chemin Montréal
suite 101B
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lyne Pitre Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pitre ( CPSO# 57073 )

Business Address:
101B - 745 Chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNE PITRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987