Pitt, Tracy Joy (CPSO#: 90216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Howard University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21400
Fax: (416) 242-1095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

405-27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Canada
Phone: 416-516-4111
Fax: 416-516-1104
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

404-586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-489-3273
Fax: 416-489-1510
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pitt ( CPSO# 90216 )

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Suite 117A
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Business Address:
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Tracy Joy Pitt may practise medicine independently in paediatrics and
                  clinical immunology and allergy.