Plantive, Richard (CPSO#: 87572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Montfort
Department of Emergency Medicine
713 chemin Montreal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO Box 17046
1937 Portobello Blvd.
Orléans, ON
K4A 4W8
Orleans ON  K4A 4W8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

43 Bruyère St.
Ottawa, ON
K1N 5C8
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 1000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Plantive Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Plantive ( CPSO# 87572 )

Business Address:
1937 Portobello Boulevard
PO Box 17046
Ottawa ON  K4A 4W8

Business Address:
Hopital Montfort
Department of Emergency Medicine
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD PLANTIVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANTIVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Dec 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 06 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2015 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2007