Platzker, Daniel Dani (CPSO#: 83139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Medical College of Wisconsin, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: (416) 515-0590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Platzker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Platzker ( CPSO# 83139 )

Business Address:
The Doctor's Office
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 598-1703

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Aug 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL DANI PLATZKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATZKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007