Pocrnich, Dante Michael (CPSO#: 51711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 306
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 742-2000
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dante M. Pocrnich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pocrnich ( CPSO# 51711 )

Business Address:
306 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 742-2000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANTE MICHAEL POCRNICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POCRNICH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1985