Pontarini, Galdino (CPSO#: 30015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Medical Place
Suite 202
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 275-3822
Fax: (905) 275-4001
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Galdino E. Pontarini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pontarini ( CPSO# 30015 )

Business Address:
Medical Place Primary Care Centre
202 - 170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone Number: (905) 275-0185

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2000
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Mar 2001
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Dec 2001
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 24 Apr 2006
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2006
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 24 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Oct 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Oct 2015 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2 UNDERTAKINGS)

            As  from  October  12,  2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr.Galdino Pontarini, in
            accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Pontarini  to  the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                         DR. GALDINO PONTARINI
                                           ("Dr. Pontarini")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini, certificate of registration number 30015, am a member
                  of the College.   The  College  has  received  information  regarding  my
                  standard of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by the terms of
                  this Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (3)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr.  Pontarini,  undertake  to  practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical    supervisor    acceptable    to   the    College    (the
                        "Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                  (b)   I,   Dr.   Pontarini,   acknowledge  that  I  have   reviewed   the
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking,  attached  hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Supervisor(s). 
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  undertake  to  co-operate   fully   with   the
                        supervision  of  my  practice  ("Clinical  Supervision"), conducted
                        under this term of the Undertaking and Appendix  "A"  attached, and
                        to abide by the recommendations of my Supervisor(s), including  but
                        not  limited  to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pontarini,  undertake  to  ensure  that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the  College  within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  undertake  that  if a person who has given  an
                        undertaking  in  Appendix  "A"  to this Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill  its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20)  days  of  receiving  notice  of  same,   obtain  an  executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified  person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr. Pontarini, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Supervisor
                        on the terms set out in sections (3)(e) and (f) above, I will cease
                        practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr.  Pontarini, agree that if I am required to cease practice as
                        a result  of  sections  (3)(g)  above  this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate  of Registration and said
                        term,  condition  or  limitation  will be included  on  the  public
                        register.
                  
            (4)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pontarini, undertake that, approximately  twelve (12) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (3)  above  and  Appendix  "A"  attached,  I  will  submit   to   a
                        reassessment  of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors  selected   by   the   College  (the  "Assessor(s)").   I
                        acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment  may  include  a  chart
                        review,  direct  observation of my care, interviews with colleagues
                        and co-workers, feedback  from  patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  undertake  to  co-operate   fully   with   the
                        Reassessment,  conducted under this term of the Undertaking, and to
                        abide by those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved
                        by the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pontarini,  acknowledge  and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with  the  Assessor(s)  any issues or  concerns  arising  from  the
                        Reassessment.   I  also  acknowledge   that   the  results  of  the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pontarini, understand and agree that if  I  am  of  the view
                        that  any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable,  I
                        will  have   thirty   (30)   days   following  my  receipt  of  the
                        recommendations  within  which  to  provide  the  College  with  my
                        submissions in this regard.  I further  understand  and  agree that
                        thereafter,  the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee  ("ICR
                        Committee") will  consider  my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the  recommendations,  or any of them, are
                        reasonable  and  if  so,  whether they, or any of them,  constitute
                        limitations or restrictions  on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Pontarini, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (5)(d) above, I will  abide  by those recommendations of
                        the  Assessor(s)  that  the  ICR  Committee  has   determined   are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition  or  limitation  on my Certificate of
                        Registration,  for  the  purposes  of  section  23  of  the  Health
                        Professions  Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the  Regulated
                        Health Professions  Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations  of  the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice  and  which  the  ICR Committee has
                        identified  in  its  decision  referenced  in  section  (5)(d)   as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (5)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pontarini, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location   that   I   practise   including,  but  not  limited  to,
                        hospital(s),   clinic(s)  and  office(s),   in   any   jurisdiction
                        (collectively my  "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.   Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all  new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pontarini, undertake and agree that  I  will  submit to, and
                        not   interfere   with,  unannounced  inspections  of  my  Practice
                        Location(s) and patient records by a College representative for the
                        purposes  of monitoring  my  compliance  with  the  terms  of  this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pontarini,  give  my  irrevocable  consent to the College to
                        make  appropriate  enquiries of the Ontario Health  Insurance  Plan
                        ("OHIP"),  the  Drug  Program   Services   Branch,   the  Narcotics
                        Monitoring  System  ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics  Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010  and/or  any  person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for  the  College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pontarini, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "B"  and Appendix "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (6)   I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  undertake  to  comply  with  this  Undertaking   and
                  acknowledge  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee
                  of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Pontarini, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Pontarini,  acknowledge  that  I  shall  be solely responsible for
                  payment  of  all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.  arising  from  the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Pontarini, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and  conditions  provided  in  this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained  independent  legal  counsel  in reviewing  and  executing  this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Pontarini, acknowledge that this  entire  Undertaking  constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration  for
                  the  purposes  of  section  23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code,
                  which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
                  Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,  c.  18,  as amended. I understand that
                  this Undertaking shall be information on the  College's  Register that is
                  available  to  the  public  during  the  time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Pontarini, acknowledge that the following  summary  will appear on
                  the  College's Register that is available to the public during  the  time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr.  Pontarini  was the subject of an assessment of his practice by
                        an assessor selected by the College. As a result of the assessment:
                  
                              Dr. Pontarini  will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              Dr. Pontarini's  practice  will  be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within 12  months  of  the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Pontarini, give my irrevocable consent to the College  to  provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any  information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information  arising  from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Pontarini, give my irrevocable  consent  to the College to provide
                  this  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities  approved  by  the  College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges  ("Chief(s)  of Staff"), and
                  to  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the  College  has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information  arising  from  the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I,  Dr.  Pontarini,  give  my  irrevocable   consent   to   all  Clinical
                  Supervisors,  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the  College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant  to  the  terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes  of  monitoring  my  compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
            (2 of 2 UNDERTAKINGS)

            As  from  June  26,  2012,  the  following is imposed as a term, condition  and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Galdino Pontarini, in
            accordance with an undertaking and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Pontarini  to  the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Pontarini  has  relinquished, and will never re-apply for or seek to
                  obtain, his prescribing  privileges  with respect to the following drugs,
                  substances and preparations set out in  the corresponding regulations, as
                  amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
            Drug/Substance                             Relinquished      Not Relinquished
            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)          X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                       X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)              X

                  As from June 26, 2000, by order of the Discipline  Committee  on June 26,
                  2000,  Dr.  Galdino  Pontarini  is  prohibited  from practising emergency
                  medicine  until  such  time  as  he  satisfies  the  Registrar,   at  the
                  Registrar's sole discretion, that he is fit to return to the practice  of
                  emergency  medicine  and  has  been properly retrained in the practice of
                  emergency medicine.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2012
Summary:

On June 26, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Galdino Pontarini committed an act 
of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession, and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Pontarini did not contest the allegations. 
 
Dr. Pontarini is a family physician practising in Mississauga, Ontario. 
 
Dr. Pontarini persistently failed to meet the standard of practice in respect of record-keeping in 
the 21 charts reviewed by the College's expert. Dr. Pontarini's clinical notes were deficient in at 
least 50% of the entries in all of the 21 patient charts reviewed. Many were extremely brief to the 
point that it was not possible to determine whether the patient was adequately assessed. 
 
Eight of the patient charts reviewed by the expert involved the prescribing of stimulants. Dr. 
Pontarini failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in regard to his prescribing 
of stimulants to all eight patients. In particular, the deficiencies included treating patients with 
stimulants without a supporting diagnosis and/or appropriate assessment, failing to appropriately 
monitor compliance or the effects of the stimulants prescribed, and failing to take appropriate 
precautions for the safe prescribing of stimulants. 
 
Between August 13, 2009 and September 16, 2010, Dr. Pontarini wrote ten prescriptions for a 
dog that belonged to one of his patients. The prescriptions were for phenobarbital and for 
potassium bromide. Dr. Pontarini is not licensed to practise veterinary medicine. 
 
On July 7, 2011, Dr. Pontarini executed an undertaking to the College voluntarily relinquishing 
his prescribing privileges for narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs and 
benzodiazepines and other targeted substances. Dr. Pontarini has now executed an undertaking to 
the College that he will never reapply for such privileges. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Pontarini's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) 
      month, to commence on June 30, 2012 at 11:59 p.m.; 
 
2.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Pontarini's 
      certificate of registration until the reassessment referred to in paragraph 5(b) below has 
      been completed, with the exception that paragraph 5(d) shall remain in effect:  
 
      a.    Dr. Pontarini shall participate in and successfully complete an educational 
            program in medical record-keeping with a preceptor who is to be approved by the 
            College in its sole discretion and who has within forty-five (45) days of the date of 
            this Order signed an undertaking to the College in the form attached hereto as 
            "Schedule A." The preceptorship shall be terminated after twelve (12) months, 
            with Dr. Pontarini meeting to review and discuss charts monthly with the 
            preceptor, decreasing to bi-monthly meetings after three (3) months if approved 
            by the preceptor and the College.  Dr. Pontarini shall abide by all 
            recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice improvements and/or 
            professional development;  
 
      b.    Within twelve (12) months of completing the preceptorship required by paragraph 
            5(a) above, Dr. Pontarini shall undergo a reassessment with regard to medical 
            record-keeping by a College-appointed assessor.  Dr. Pontarini shall abide by all 
            recommendations with regard to medical record-keeping made by the assessor, 
            and the results of the reassessment shall be reported to the College; 
 
      c.    Dr. Pontarini shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and 
            enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; and 
 
      d.    Dr. Pontarini shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
            implementing the terms of this Order 
. 
3.    Dr. Pontarini attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
 
4.    Dr. Pontarini shall within thirty (30) days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in 
      the amount of $3,650.00.At the conclusion of the hearing, Dr. Pontarini waived his right 
      to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the Committee administered the 
      public reprimand. 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 26, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 2006
Summary:

 On April 24, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Pontarini to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he was found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his 
 suitability to practice.  Dr. Pontarini was found guilty of four counts of willfully evading or 
 attempting to evade the payment of taxes stemming from income and expenses relating to his medical 
 practice.  The Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Pontarini's 
 certificate of registration for a period of two months effective May 1, 2006.

2.	The Registrar 
 imposed the following term, condition and limitation be placed on Dr. Pontarini(s certificate of 
 registration:

i)	Dr. Pontarini shall ensure the completeness and accuracy of his income tax 
 returns be verified by an accountant annually for a period of two years (at Dr. Pontarini(s 
 expense) and that the accountant should be identified in advance and pre-approved by the CPSO and 
 that the accountant report back to the CPSO with his/her findings after each review.

3.	Dr. 
 Pontarini appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

4.	Dr. Pontarini pay costs in the amount of 
 $2,500 by May 24, 2006.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 24, 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2000
Summary:

On June 26, 2000, the Discipline Committee heard Dr. Pontarini s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional 
misconduct in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise; in that he failed to maintain the 
records that are required to be kept pursuant to paragraph 18 of Part V of O.Reg. 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991; 
and that he prescribed, dispensed or sold drugs for an improper purpose.    The Committee subsequently ordered the 
following penalty: 
 
1.    Dr. Pontarini be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register;  
 
2.    the Registrar suspend Dr. Pontarini s certificate of registration for a period of nine months, three months of which will 
      be suspended on the following conditions (the suspension ): 
      (a)   Dr. Pontarini undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the College ) never to 
            re-apply for narcotics prescribing privileges;  
       
      (b)   Dr. Pontarini undertakes to the College to undergo Physician Review Program ( PREP ) and a practice 
            assessment at his own expense and abide by any recommendations and file proof to the satisfaction of the 
            Registrar of having taken PREP and having implemented any recommendations made; and 
 
      (c)   Dr.  Pontarini  undertakes  that  if  he  fails  to  obtain  a  result  of  better  than  category  4  in  PREP,  he  will 
            immediately cease the practice of medicine until such time as he achieves a result of category 3 or better. 
 
3.    the suspension may be served in two three month intervals to commence on dates to be fixed by the Registrar as 
      follows: 
 
      (a)   the first three month suspension period shall commence on or before December 1, 2000; and 
       
      (b)   the second three month suspension period shall commence within six months of the termination of the first 
            suspension period. 
       
4.    the Registrar to impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Pontarini s certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Pontarini be prohibited from practicing emergency medicine until such time as he satisfies the Registrar, 
            at his sole discretion, that he is fit to return to the practice of emergency medicine, and until he has been 
            properly retrained in the practice of emergency medicine. 
       
5.    any breach of the undertakings will be cause for the immediate institution of the remaining three month suspension 
      period and could be cause for further disciplinary proceedings.  
 
6.    Dr. Pontarini to pay the costs of these proceedings fixed in the sum of $15,000.00 said costs to be paid within five 
      months of the date of this order. 
 
                         

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2000

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 12, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Galdino Pontarini to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 12, 2015:

Dr. Pontarini was the subject of an assessment of his practice by an assessor selected by the College. As a result of the assessment:

Dr. Pontarini will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Pontarini’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.