Poonai, Naveen P (CPSO#: 81099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poonai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Poonai ( CPSO# 81099 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Paedatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVEEN P POONAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POONAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009