Poonja, Zahir (CPSO#: 59817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Urdu

Education:University of Manchester, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Eagle Ridge Family Health Centre
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zahir Poonja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Poonja ( CPSO# 59817 )

Business Address:
Eagle Ridge Family Health Centre
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 727-7688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHIR POONJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POONJA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1989