Pope, Marc (CPSO#: 60898)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-7777
Fax: (905) 919-1698
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope ( CPSO# 67701 )
Dr. M. Pope ( CPSO# 60898 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 15 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990