Porfiris, George S (CPSO#: 68289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 461-1171
Fax: (416) 461-1172
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Porfiris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Porfiris ( CPSO# 68289 )

Business Address:
202 - 245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 461-1171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE S PORFIRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORFIRIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996