Porwal, Hemraj Ratanchand (CPSO#: 78899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-4383, Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: 905-356-5945
Fax: 905-356-7206
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Canada
Phone: 1-855-854-7325
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

7600 Weston Road
Toronto ON  L4L 8B7
Canada
Phone: 1-855-371-3500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

6400, Valley Way
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7E3
Canada
Phone: 905-358-3277
Fax: 905-358-3012
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hemraj R. Porwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Porwal ( CPSO# 78899 )

Business Address:
6400 Valley Way
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7E3
Phone Number: (905) 359-3277

Business Address:
4384 Portage Road
Suite 101
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 356-5945

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEMRAJ RATANCHAND PORWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003