Pothos, Mary (CPSO#: 57386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Pothos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pothos ( CPSO# 57386 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY POTHOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTHOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Aug 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991