Potter, Miriam Deborah (CPSO#: 74831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 766-1490
Fax: (519) 836-9530
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miriam Potter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Potter ( CPSO# 74831 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 766-1490

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM DEBORAH POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2002