Prabhakaran, Varagur Mohan (CPSO#: 32170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Bangalore University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunningdale Health & Wellness Centr
1695 WONDERLAND Rd. N.
London ON  N6G 4W3
Phone: (519) 4717272
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll, Ontario
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: 519 485 9617
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARAGUR MOHAN PRABHAKARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRABHAKARAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995