Pradko, Jacqueline Ann (CPSO#: 71085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
City Centre Walk-In Clinic
500 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3H9
Phone: (519) 254-0605
Fax: (519) 254-0609
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Roseville Garden Clinic
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Canada
Phone: 519-944-3393
Fax: 519-944-3247
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Roseville Garden Walk-in Clinic
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANN PRADKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1999