Pradko, James Fred (CPSO#: 63617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Roseville Walk-In Clinic
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 3J8
Phone: (519) 944-3393
Fax: (519) 944-3247
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1168 Drouillard Road
Windsor ON  N8Y 2R1
Canada
Phone: (519) 946-0740
Fax: (519) 946-0743
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

500 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor ON  N9A 3H9
Canada
Phone: 519-254-0605
Fax: 519-254-0609
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 May 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FRED PRADKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRADKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2013