Prasad, Sadhana (CPSO#: 51402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6425
Fax: (519) 749-6498
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 291-3290
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Grand River Hospital Corporation
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadhana Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Prasad ( CPSO# 51402 )
Dr. R. Schmidt ( CPSO# 92881 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Corporation
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3290

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6929

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 12 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADHANA PRASAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRASAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1985