Pratt, Lynn (CPSO#: 30878)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: Pratt, Susan Lynn (used until: 08 Feb 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lynn Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Fort William Clinic 1260 Golf Links Road Thunder Bay, ON P7B 0A1
Date Received: 12 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2017