Pratt, Melanie Dawn (CPSO#: 30645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Room 464
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10441
Fax: (613) 761-4692
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pratt ( CPSO# 30645 )
Dr. C. Kelly ( CPSO# 31147 )

Business Address:
Suite 464
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN PRATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983