Preston, Gordon Lewis (CPSO#: 27311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1975

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 251-5008
Fax: (416) 251-0861
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Preston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Preston ( CPSO# 27311 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 251-5008

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON LEWIS PRESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRESTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: September 21, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

SCERP Summary:

On September 21, 2017, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Gordon Lewis Preston, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Preston to:

Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the next available course in medical record-keeping offered by the University of Toronto and the next available Canadian Medical Protective Association (CMPA) eLearning courses in medical record-keeping.

Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months.

Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to general family medicine:

o CPSO Medical Records policy #4-12;
o Patient Health Questionnaire (PHQ-9) Overview;
o A Psychiatric View of Symptoms: A Screening Tool for Family Physicians;
o Diabetes flow sheet; and
o Preventative Care Checklist forms.

Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 6 months following the completion of the Education Plan.